1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 5976 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC002031 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO TOWNS AN D CITIES -- STATE AID |
---|
16 | 16 | | Introduced By: Representatives Giraldo, Voas, and Morales |
---|
17 | 17 | | Date Introduced: March 01, 2023 |
---|
18 | 18 | | Referred To: House Finance |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 1. Section 45-13-5.1 of the General Laws in Chapter 45-13 entitled "State Aid" 1 |
---|
23 | 23 | | is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 |
---|
24 | 24 | | 45-13-5.1. General assembly appropriations in lieu of property tax from certain 3 |
---|
25 | 25 | | exempt private and state properties. 4 |
---|
26 | 26 | | (a) In lieu of the amount of local real property tax on real property owned by any private 5 |
---|
27 | 27 | | nonprofit institution of higher education, or any nonprofit hospital facility, or any state owned and 6 |
---|
28 | 28 | | operated hospital, veterans’ residential facility, or any municipal detention facility corporation 7 |
---|
29 | 29 | | created pursuant to § 45-54-1, or correctional facility occupied by more than one hundred (100) 8 |
---|
30 | 30 | | residents which may have been or will be exempted from taxation by applicable state law, exclusive 9 |
---|
31 | 31 | | of any facility operated by the federal government, the state of Rhode Island, or any of its 10 |
---|
32 | 32 | | subdivisions, the general assembly shall annually appropriate for payment to the several cities and 11 |
---|
33 | 33 | | towns in which the property lies a sum equal to twenty-seven percent (27%) of all tax that would 12 |
---|
34 | 34 | | have been collected had the real property been taxable; provided, however, said percentage shall 13 |
---|
35 | 35 | | be subject to adjustment pursuant to subsection (e) of this section. 14 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (b) In no event shall any city or town record in a fiscal year both: (1) Taxes and/or payments 15 |
---|
37 | 37 | | under a stabilization agreement with a for-profit hospital facility; and (2) Distributions of 16 |
---|
38 | 38 | | appropriations under this section attributable to the prior nonprofit status of said for-profit hospital 17 |
---|
39 | 39 | | facility. 18 |
---|
40 | 40 | | (c) As used in this section, “private nonprofit institution of higher education” means any 19 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | LC002031 - Page 2 of 3 |
---|
44 | 44 | | institution engaged primarily in education beyond the high school level, the property of which is 1 |
---|
45 | 45 | | exempt from property tax under any of the subdivisions, and “nonprofit hospital facility” means 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | any nonprofit hospital licensed by the state and which is used for the purpose of general medical, 3 |
---|
47 | 47 | | surgical, or psychiatric care and treatment. 4 |
---|
48 | 48 | | (d) The grant payable to any municipality under the provision of this section shall be equal 5 |
---|
49 | 49 | | to twenty-seven percent (27%) of the property taxes that, except for any exemption to any 6 |
---|
50 | 50 | | institution of higher education or general hospital facility, would have been paid with respect to 7 |
---|
51 | 51 | | that exempt real property on the assessment list in the municipality for the assessment date of 8 |
---|
52 | 52 | | December 31, 1986, and with respect to such exempt real property appearing on an assessment list 9 |
---|
53 | 53 | | in the municipality on succeeding assessment dates. Provided, however, that the grant paid for the 10 |
---|
54 | 54 | | fiscal year ending June 30, 2008, shall be based upon the assessment list in the municipality as of 11 |
---|
55 | 55 | | December 31, 2004. 12 |
---|
56 | 56 | | (e) The state budget offices shall include the amount of the annual appropriation in the state 13 |
---|
57 | 57 | | budget for the fiscal year commencing July 1, 1988, and each fiscal year thereafter. The amount of 14 |
---|
58 | 58 | | the annual distribution of appropriation payable to each eligible municipality in any year in 15 |
---|
59 | 59 | | accordance with this section shall be reduced proportionately in the event that the total of the annual 16 |
---|
60 | 60 | | appropriation in the state budget is insufficient to pay the eligible municipalities the amounts 17 |
---|
61 | 61 | | otherwise payable to said communities pursuant to subsection (a) of this section. 18 |
---|
62 | 62 | | (f) Distribution of appropriations shall be made by the state on or before July 31 of 1988 19 |
---|
63 | 63 | | and each July 31 thereafter or following verified receipt of a municipality’s assessment data for the 20 |
---|
64 | 64 | | following fiscal year’s payment, whichever is later, and the payments may be counted as a 21 |
---|
65 | 65 | | receivable by any city or town for a fiscal year ending the preceding June 30. 22 |
---|
66 | 66 | | (g) Any act or omission by the state with respect to this chapter shall in no way diminish 23 |
---|
67 | 67 | | the duty of any town or municipality to provide public safety or other ordinary services to the 24 |
---|
68 | 68 | | properties or facilities of the type listed in subsection (a). 25 |
---|
69 | 69 | | (h) Provided, that payments authorized pursuant to this section shall be reduced pro rata, 26 |
---|
70 | 70 | | for that period of time that the municipality suspends or reduces essential services to eligible 27 |
---|
71 | 71 | | facilities. For the purposes of this section “essential services” include, but are not to be limited to, 28 |
---|
72 | 72 | | police, fire and rescue. 29 |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 30 |
---|
74 | 74 | | ======== |
---|
75 | 75 | | LC002031 |
---|
76 | 76 | | ======== |
---|
77 | 77 | | |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | LC002031 - Page 3 of 3 |
---|
80 | 80 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
81 | 81 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
82 | 82 | | OF |
---|
83 | 83 | | A N A C T |
---|
84 | 84 | | RELATING TO TOWNS AN D CITIES -- STATE AID |
---|
85 | 85 | | *** |
---|
86 | 86 | | This act would include municipal detention facility corporations as exempt from taxation 1 |
---|
87 | 87 | | under state law, and require the general assembly to appropriate, annually, for payment to the city 2 |
---|
88 | 88 | | or town where the property is located a sum equal to twenty-seven percent (27%) of all tax that 3 |
---|
89 | 89 | | would have been collected if the property was taxable. 4 |
---|
90 | 90 | | This act would take effect upon passage. 5 |
---|
91 | 91 | | ======== |
---|
92 | 92 | | LC002031 |
---|
93 | 93 | | ======== |
---|