House | 06/23/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Meeting postponed (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2023) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |