Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5994 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/01/2023

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- H 5994 
======== 
LC002260 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO HUMAN SE RVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE 
Introduced By: Representatives Morales, Caldwell, Vella-Wilkinson, Sanchez, Potter, 
Giraldo, Felix, Henries, Speakman, and Donovan 
Date Introduced: March 01, 2023 
Referred To: House Finance 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 40-8-3 of the General Laws in Chapter 40-8 entitled "Medical 1 
Assistance" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
40-8-3. Eligibility requirements. 3 
Medical care benefits shall be provided under this chapter to at least any person: 4 
(1) Who has attained the age of sixty-five (65) years; or 5 
(2) Who has no vision or whose vision is so defective as to prevent performance of ordinary 6 
activities for which eyesight is essential; or 7 
(3) Who is at least eighteen (18) years of age and who is permanently and totally disabled; 8 
or 9 
(4) Who is under the age of eighteen (18) years, and who has been deprived of parental 10 
support or care by reason of the death, continued absence from the home, unemployment, or 11 
physical or mental incapacity of a parent (called hereafter “dependent child”) and who is living 12 
with a relative in a place of residence maintained by one or more of these relatives as his or her or 13 
their own home, or is in foster boarding care; or 14 
(5) The relative as defined in subsection (8) of § 40-8-2, with whom the dependent child is 15 
living; provided the person: 16 
(i) Is a resident of this state; and 17 
(ii) Is not receiving public assistance under the provisions of § 40-5.1-9(b) [repealed] or § 18 
40-6-27; and 19   
 
 
LC002260 - Page 2 of 5 
(iii) Is not an inmate of a public institution other than as a patient in a medical institution; 1 
and 2 
(iv) Is not a patient in an institution for tuberculosis or mental disease, unless the person 3 
has attained the age of sixty-five (65) years; provided, however, that this clause shall become void 4 
and of no effect if and when legislation enacted by the Congress of the United States shall become 5 
effective providing for payments for medical care on behalf of persons who have not attained the 6 
age of sixty-five (65) years who are patients in an institution for tuberculosis or mental disease; and 7 
(v) Has insufficient income and resources. The department shall establish income and 8 
resource rules, regulations, and limits in accordance with Title XIX of the federal Social Security 9 
Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1396 et seq., as applicable to the medically needy only applicants and recipients. 10 
The income limits established by the department must be more than the AFDC standard in effect 11 
on July 16, 1996, under the Rhode Island state plan approved under part A of Title IV of the federal 12 
Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. § 601 et seq., but shall not be more than one hundred thirty-three 13 
and one-third percent (133⅓%) of the AFDC standard in effect on July 16, 1996, under the Rhode 14 
Island state plan approved under part A of Title IV of the federal Social Security Act; provided, 15 
however, that subject to the maximum percentage increase allowable under § 1931(b)(2)(B), the 16 
department shall increase the income limits on July 1, 1999, by six and six-tenths percent (6.6%), 17 
and on January 1, of each year commencing in the year 2000 by a percentage equal to the annual 18 
federal adjustment percentage as determined under the provisions of Title XVI of the federal Social 19 
Security Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1381 et seq. The department shall establish resource limits equal to two 20 
thousand dollars ($2,000) for an individual and three thousand dollars ($3,000) for a family. 21 
Provided, however, the department shall apply to the United States Department of Health and 22 
Human Services for a waiver relating to application of the reduced resource limit, and subject to 23 
the granting of the waiver by the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human 24 
Services, the resource limit shall be applied to all applicants who: (A) Become eligible for benefits 25 
under this chapter on or after the effective date of this amendment and (B) Who were not receiving 26 
benefits under this chapter prior to July 1, 1993. In the event the secretary does not approve the 27 
waiver request, the current department regulations relating to resource limits shall remain in effect 28 
for all eligible beneficiaries. 29 
For the purposes of this section, an increase in a recipient’s income due solely to a cost-of-30 
living adjustment to Social Security and Railroad Retirement payments, shall be disregarded when 31 
determining the recipient’s eligibility for medical assistance. 32 
For the purposes of this subsection, a vehicle necessary to transport a family member with 33 
a disability, where the vehicle is specially equipped to meet the specific needs of the person with a 34   
 
 
LC002260 - Page 3 of 5 
disability or if the vehicle is a special type of vehicle that makes it possible to transport the person 1 
with the disability, shall not be counted as resources of the applicants and recipients. 2 
SECTION 2. Section 40-6-8 of the General Laws in Chapter 40-6 entitled "Public 3 
Assistance Act" is hereby amended to read as follows: 4 
40-6-8. Supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP). 5 
(a) The department shall have the responsibility to administer the food stamp program for 6 
the state in compliance with the provisions of the federal Food Stamp Act of 1964, as amended, 7 7 
U.S.C. § 2011 et seq. The supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP) is and shall be the 8 
new title of the program formerly known as the food stamp program. All references in the Rhode 9 
Island general laws to food stamps shall be deemed to mean, apply to, refer to, and be interpreted 10 
in accordance with the supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP). 11 
(b) The department is empowered and authorized to submit its plan for food stamps to the 12 
federal government, or any agency or department of it, as follows: 13 
(1) The department shall act for the state in any negotiations relative to the submission and 14 
approval of a plan, and may make any arrangement or changes in its plan not inconsistent with this 15 
chapter that may be required by the Food Stamp Act or the rules and regulations promulgated 16 
pursuant to it to obtain and retain such approval and to secure for this state the benefits of the 17 
provisions of the federal act relating to food stamps; 18 
(2) The department shall make reports to the federal government, or any agency or 19 
department of it, in the form and nature required by it, and in all respects comply with any request 20 
or direction of the federal government, or any agency or department of it, that may be necessary to 21 
assure the correctness and verification of the reports; and 22 
(3) The department shall develop a plan to streamline the application, certification, and 23 
recertification process for SNAP beneficiaries aged sixty (60) years and over. 24 
(c) The department is authorized and directed to pay one hundred percent (100%) of the 25 
state’s share of the administrative cost involved in the operation of the food stamp program. 26 
(d) No person shall be ineligible for food stamp benefits due solely to the restricted 27 
eligibility rules otherwise imposed by § 115(a)(2) of the Personal Responsibility and Work 28 
Opportunity Reconciliation Act of 1996 (Pub. L. No. 104-193), 21 U.S.C. § 862a(a)(2), and as this 29 
section may hereafter be amended. 30 
(e) For the purposes of this section, an increase in a person’s income due solely to a cost-31 
of-living adjustment to Social Security and Railroad Retirement payments, shall be disregarded 32 
when determining the recipient’s eligibility for SNAP benefits.  33   
 
 
LC002260 - Page 4 of 5 
SECTION 3. This act shall take effect upon passage. 1 
======== 
LC002260 
========  
 
 
LC002260 - Page 5 of 5 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO HUMAN SE RVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE 
***
This act would disregard an increase in a recipient’s income due solely to a cost-of-living 1 
adjustment to Social Security and Railroad Retirement payments, when determining the recipient’s 2 
eligibility for medical assistance and supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP) benefits. 3 
This act would take effect upon passage. 4 
======== 
LC002260 
========