Senate | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2023) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2023) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |