House | 06/12/2023 | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Scheduled for consideration | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |