House | 06/06/2023 | House voted to recommit to House Corporations | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |