House | 05/18/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/16/2023) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/11/2023) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2023) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |