Senate | 06/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Commerce | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2023) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2023) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |