Senate | 06/05/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2023) | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2023) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2023) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |