2023 -- H 6078 ======== LC002470 ======== S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 ____________ A N A C T RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES Introduced By: Representative David P. Morales Date Introduced: March 03, 2023 Referred To: House Labor It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: SECTION 1. Section 28-12-3 of the General Laws in Chapter 28-12 entitled "Minimum 1 Wages" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 28-12-3. Minimum wages. 3 (a) Every employer shall pay to each of his or her employees: commencing July 1, 1999, 4 at least the minimum wage of five dollars and sixty-five cents ($5.65) per hour. Commencing 5 September 1, 2000, the minimum wage is six dollars and fifteen cents ($6.15) per hour. 6 (b) Commencing January 1, 2004, the minimum wage is six dollars and seventy-five cents 7 ($6.75) per hour. 8 (c) Commencing March 1, 2006, the minimum wage is seven dollars and ten cents ($7.10) 9 per hour. 10 (d) Commencing January 1, 2007, the minimum wage is seven dollars and forty cents 11 ($7.40) per hour. 12 (e) Commencing January 1, 2013, the minimum wage is seven dollars and seventy-five 13 cents ($7.75) per hour. 14 (f) Commencing January 1, 2014, the minimum wage is eight dollars ($8.00) per hour. 15 (g) Commencing January 1, 2015, the minimum wage is nine dollars ($9.00) per hour. 16 (h) Commencing January 1, 2016, the minimum wage is nine dollars and sixty cents ($9.60) 17 per hour. 18 (i) Commencing January 1, 2018, the minimum wage is ten dollars and ten cents ($10.10) 19 LC002470 - Page 2 of 3 per hour. 1 (j) Commencing January 1, 2019, the minimum wage is ten dollars and fifty cents ($10.50) 2 per hour. 3 (k) Commencing October 1, 2020, the minimum wage is eleven dollars and fifty cents 4 ($11.50) per hour. 5 (l) Commencing January 1, 2022, the minimum wage is twelve dollars and twenty-five 6 cents ($12.25) per hour. 7 (m) Commencing January 1, 2023, the minimum wage is thirteen dollars ($13.00) per hour. 8 (n) Commencing January 1, 2024, the minimum wage is fourteen dollars ($14.00) per hour. 9 (o) Commencing January 1, 2025, the minimum wage is fifteen dollars ($15.00) fifteen 10 dollars and fifty cents ($15.50) per hour. 11 (p) Commencing January 1, 2026, the minimum wage is seventeen dollars ($17.00) per 12 hour. 13 (q) Commencing January 1, 2027, the minimum wage is eighteen dollars and fifty cents 14 ($18.50) per hour. 15 (r) Commencing January 1, 2028, the minimum wage is twenty dollars ($20.00) per hour. 16 (s) Commencing January 1, 2029, and each January 1 thereafter, the minimum wage shall 17 be adjusted by the increase, if any, in the cost of living. The increase in the cost of living shall be 18 measured by the percentage increase, if any, as of August of the previous year over the level as of 19 August of the year preceding that year in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-20 U), as published by the United States Department of Labor Statistics or its successor agency, with 21 the amount of the minimum wage increase rounded to the nearest multiple of five cents ($.05). 22 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 23 ======== LC002470 ======== LC002470 - Page 3 of 3 EXPLANATION BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL OF A N A C T RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES *** This act would raise the minimum wage for the years 2025, 2026, 2027 and 2028 to fifteen 1 dollars and fifty cents ($15.50), seventeen dollars ($17.00), eighteen dollars and fifty cents 2 ($18.50), and twenty dollars ($20.00) per hour, respectively. 3 This act would take effect upon passage. 4 ======== LC002470 ========