1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 6078 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC002470 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES |
---|
16 | 16 | | Introduced By: Representative David P. Morales |
---|
17 | 17 | | Date Introduced: March 03, 2023 |
---|
18 | 18 | | Referred To: House Labor |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 1. Section 28-12-3 of the General Laws in Chapter 28-12 entitled "Minimum 1 |
---|
23 | 23 | | Wages" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 |
---|
24 | 24 | | 28-12-3. Minimum wages. 3 |
---|
25 | 25 | | (a) Every employer shall pay to each of his or her employees: commencing July 1, 1999, 4 |
---|
26 | 26 | | at least the minimum wage of five dollars and sixty-five cents ($5.65) per hour. Commencing 5 |
---|
27 | 27 | | September 1, 2000, the minimum wage is six dollars and fifteen cents ($6.15) per hour. 6 |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) Commencing January 1, 2004, the minimum wage is six dollars and seventy-five cents 7 |
---|
29 | 29 | | ($6.75) per hour. 8 |
---|
30 | 30 | | (c) Commencing March 1, 2006, the minimum wage is seven dollars and ten cents ($7.10) 9 |
---|
31 | 31 | | per hour. 10 |
---|
32 | 32 | | (d) Commencing January 1, 2007, the minimum wage is seven dollars and forty cents 11 |
---|
33 | 33 | | ($7.40) per hour. 12 |
---|
34 | 34 | | (e) Commencing January 1, 2013, the minimum wage is seven dollars and seventy-five 13 |
---|
35 | 35 | | cents ($7.75) per hour. 14 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (f) Commencing January 1, 2014, the minimum wage is eight dollars ($8.00) per hour. 15 |
---|
37 | 37 | | (g) Commencing January 1, 2015, the minimum wage is nine dollars ($9.00) per hour. 16 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (h) Commencing January 1, 2016, the minimum wage is nine dollars and sixty cents ($9.60) 17 |
---|
39 | 39 | | per hour. 18 |
---|
40 | 40 | | (i) Commencing January 1, 2018, the minimum wage is ten dollars and ten cents ($10.10) 19 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | LC002470 - Page 2 of 3 |
---|
44 | 44 | | per hour. 1 |
---|
45 | 45 | | (j) Commencing January 1, 2019, the minimum wage is ten dollars and fifty cents ($10.50) 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | per hour. 3 |
---|
47 | 47 | | (k) Commencing October 1, 2020, the minimum wage is eleven dollars and fifty cents 4 |
---|
48 | 48 | | ($11.50) per hour. 5 |
---|
49 | 49 | | (l) Commencing January 1, 2022, the minimum wage is twelve dollars and twenty-five 6 |
---|
50 | 50 | | cents ($12.25) per hour. 7 |
---|
51 | 51 | | (m) Commencing January 1, 2023, the minimum wage is thirteen dollars ($13.00) per hour. 8 |
---|
52 | 52 | | (n) Commencing January 1, 2024, the minimum wage is fourteen dollars ($14.00) per hour. 9 |
---|
53 | 53 | | (o) Commencing January 1, 2025, the minimum wage is fifteen dollars ($15.00) fifteen 10 |
---|
54 | 54 | | dollars and fifty cents ($15.50) per hour. 11 |
---|
55 | 55 | | (p) Commencing January 1, 2026, the minimum wage is seventeen dollars ($17.00) per 12 |
---|
56 | 56 | | hour. 13 |
---|
57 | 57 | | (q) Commencing January 1, 2027, the minimum wage is eighteen dollars and fifty cents 14 |
---|
58 | 58 | | ($18.50) per hour. 15 |
---|
59 | 59 | | (r) Commencing January 1, 2028, the minimum wage is twenty dollars ($20.00) per hour. 16 |
---|
60 | 60 | | (s) Commencing January 1, 2029, and each January 1 thereafter, the minimum wage shall 17 |
---|
61 | 61 | | be adjusted by the increase, if any, in the cost of living. The increase in the cost of living shall be 18 |
---|
62 | 62 | | measured by the percentage increase, if any, as of August of the previous year over the level as of 19 |
---|
63 | 63 | | August of the year preceding that year in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-20 |
---|
64 | 64 | | U), as published by the United States Department of Labor Statistics or its successor agency, with 21 |
---|
65 | 65 | | the amount of the minimum wage increase rounded to the nearest multiple of five cents ($.05). 22 |
---|
66 | 66 | | SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 23 |
---|
67 | 67 | | ======== |
---|
68 | 68 | | LC002470 |
---|
69 | 69 | | ======== |
---|
70 | 70 | | |
---|
71 | 71 | | |
---|
72 | 72 | | LC002470 - Page 3 of 3 |
---|
73 | 73 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
74 | 74 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
75 | 75 | | OF |
---|
76 | 76 | | A N A C T |
---|
77 | 77 | | RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES |
---|
78 | 78 | | *** |
---|
79 | 79 | | This act would raise the minimum wage for the years 2025, 2026, 2027 and 2028 to fifteen 1 |
---|
80 | 80 | | dollars and fifty cents ($15.50), seventeen dollars ($17.00), eighteen dollars and fifty cents 2 |
---|
81 | 81 | | ($18.50), and twenty dollars ($20.00) per hour, respectively. 3 |
---|
82 | 82 | | This act would take effect upon passage. 4 |
---|
83 | 83 | | ======== |
---|
84 | 84 | | LC002470 |
---|
85 | 85 | | ======== |
---|