Senate | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/16/2023) | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2023) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |