Senate | 06/24/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/16/2023 | House passed Sub B in concurrence | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed Sub B | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub B | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/25/2023) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/19/2023) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |