House | 06/24/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2023) | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/04/2023) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |