2023 -- H 6089 ======== LC002010 ======== S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 ____________ H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES, AND REQUIRING REAPPOINTMENT OF THE MEMBERSHIP OF THE LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT , HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT , AND REGULATION Introduced By: Representatives Giraldo, Speakman, Shekarchi, Solomon, Donovan, Biah, and Chippendale Date Introduced: March 03, 2023 Referred To: House Municipal Government & Housing RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 139 1 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 2 25, 2021, entitled "HOUSE RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE 3 COMMISSION TO STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, 4 DEVELOPMENT, HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULATION" and as extended by 5 resolution No. 194 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and 6 approved March 24, 2022, entitled “HOUSE RESOLUTION EXTENDING THE REPORTING 7 AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY 8 THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT, H OUSING, 9 ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULATION” is hereby authorized to continue its study and make a 10 report to the House of Representatives on or before June 8, 2025, and said commission shall 11 expire on June 30, 2025; and be it further 12 RESOLVED, That membership in said commission shall be subject to and at the 13 discretion of reappointment by the Speaker of the House through submission of a letter of interest 14 to be submitted to the Speaker of the House by July 1, 2023; and be it further 15 RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 139 passed by the 16 House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 25, 2021, and as 17 extended by resolution No. 194 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 18 LC002010 - Page 2 of 3 A.D. 2022, and approved March 24, 2022, be and the same is hereby rescinded. 1 ======== LC002010 ======== LC002010 - Page 3 of 3 EXPLANATION BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL OF H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES, AND REQUIRING REAPPOINTMENT OF THE MEMBERSHIP OF THE LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT , HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT , AND REGULATION *** This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates and requires a letter of 1 continued interest to the speaker for reappointment of membership, to the special legislative 2 commission to study the entire area of land use, preservation, development, housing, 3 environment, and regulation, from June 8, 2023, to June 8, 2025, and said commission would 4 expire on June 30, 2025. 5 ======== LC002010 ========