House | 06/19/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2023) | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2023) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2023) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee postponed at request of sponsor | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |