House | 06/08/2023 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2023) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2023) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |