House | 06/23/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/18/2023) | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2023) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2023) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |