Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 06/03/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2023) | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2023) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/20/2023) | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |