Senate | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Senate Education | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/16/2023) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2023) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/19/2023) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Education |