House | 05/30/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2023) | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2023) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2023) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |