House | 06/07/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/01/2023) | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2023) | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2023) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2023) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |