House | 06/15/2023 | House passed as amended (floor amendment) | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Meeting postponed (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2023) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |