House | 06/12/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2023) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2023) | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |