1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 6373 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC002956 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
15 | 15 | | EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL |
---|
16 | 16 | | LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND REVIEW THE COST AND STATUS OF |
---|
17 | 17 | | THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND OWNED, VACANT, AND ABANDONED PROPER TIES |
---|
18 | 18 | | AND PROVIDE RECOMMEN DATIONS FOR METHODS TO MITIGATE THE |
---|
19 | 19 | | ASSOCIATED EXPENSES |
---|
20 | 20 | | Introduced By: Representatives Noret, Casimiro, and Costantino |
---|
21 | 21 | | Date Introduced: May 05, 2023 |
---|
22 | 22 | | Referred To: House State Government & Elections |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | |
---|
25 | 25 | | RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 295 1 |
---|
26 | 26 | | passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved May 12, 2 |
---|
27 | 27 | | 2022, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission To Study and 3 |
---|
28 | 28 | | Review the Cost and Status of the State of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, and Abandoned 4 |
---|
29 | 29 | | Properties and Provide Recommendations for Methods to Mitigate the Associated Expenses" is 5 |
---|
30 | 30 | | hereby authorized to continue its study and make a report to the House of Representatives on or 6 |
---|
31 | 31 | | before May 31, 2024, and said commission shall expire on June 30, 2024; and be it further 7 |
---|
32 | 32 | | RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 295 passed by the 8 |
---|
33 | 33 | | House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved May 12, 2022, be and 9 |
---|
34 | 34 | | the same is hereby rescinded. 10 |
---|
35 | 35 | | ======== |
---|
36 | 36 | | LC002956 |
---|
37 | 37 | | ======== |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | LC002956 - Page 2 of 2 |
---|
41 | 41 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
42 | 42 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
43 | 43 | | OF |
---|
44 | 44 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
45 | 45 | | EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL |
---|
46 | 46 | | LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND REVIEW THE COST AND STATUS OF |
---|
47 | 47 | | THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND OWNED, VACANT, AND ABANDONED PROPER TIES |
---|
48 | 48 | | AND PROVIDE RECOMMEN DATIONS FOR METHODS TO MITIGATE THE |
---|
49 | 49 | | ASSOCIATED EXPENSES |
---|
50 | 50 | | *** |
---|
51 | 51 | | This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the special legislative 1 |
---|
52 | 52 | | commission to study and review the cost and status of the State of Rhode Island owned, vacant, 2 |
---|
53 | 53 | | and abandoned properties and provide recommendations for methods to mitigate the associated 3 |
---|
54 | 54 | | expenses, from May 1, 2023, to May 31, 2024, and said commission would expire on June 30, 4 |
---|
55 | 55 | | 2024. 5 |
---|
56 | 56 | | ======== |
---|
57 | 57 | | LC002956 |
---|
58 | 58 | | ======== |
---|