1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 6374 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC002930 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO TAXATION -- HISTORIC PRESERVATION TAX CRE DITS 2013 |
---|
16 | 16 | | Introduced By: Representatives Speakman, Casey, Phillips, J. Brien, and Chippendale |
---|
17 | 17 | | Date Introduced: May 05, 2023 |
---|
18 | 18 | | Referred To: House Finance |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 1. Section 44-33.6-7 of the General Laws in Chapter 44-33.6 entitled "Historic 1 |
---|
23 | 23 | | Preservation Tax Credits 2013" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 |
---|
24 | 24 | | 44-33.6-7. Timing and reapplication. 3 |
---|
25 | 25 | | (a) Taxpayers shall have twelve (12) months from the approval of Part 2 application to 4 |
---|
26 | 26 | | commence substantial construction activities related to the subject substantial rehabilitation. Upon 5 |
---|
27 | 27 | | commencing substantial construction activities, the taxpayer shall submit an affidavit of 6 |
---|
28 | 28 | | commencement of substantial construction to the commission, together with evidence of the 7 |
---|
29 | 29 | | requirements having been satisfied. Furthermore, after commencement of substantial construction 8 |
---|
30 | 30 | | activities, no project shall remain idle prior to completion for a period of time exceeding six (6) 9 |
---|
31 | 31 | | months. In the event that a taxpayer does not commence substantial construction activities within 10 |
---|
32 | 32 | | twelve (12) months from the approval of Part 2 application, or in the event that a project remains 11 |
---|
33 | 33 | | idle prior to completion for a period of time exceeding six (6) months, the subject taxpayer shall 12 |
---|
34 | 34 | | forfeit all fees paid prior to such date and its then-current contract for tax credits shall be deemed 13 |
---|
35 | 35 | | null and void, and shall terminate without need for further action or documentation. Upon any such 14 |
---|
36 | 36 | | forfeiture and termination, a taxpayer may re-apply for tax credits pursuant to this chapter; 15 |
---|
37 | 37 | | however, notwithstanding anything contained herein to the contrary, one hundred percent (100%) 16 |
---|
38 | 38 | | of the fees required shall be paid upon reapplication and the fees shall be non-refundable. 17 |
---|
39 | 39 | | Additionally, any taxpayer reapplying for tax credits pursuant to this section shall be required to 18 |
---|
40 | 40 | | submit evidence with its application establishing the reason for delay in commencement or the 19 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | LC002930 - Page 2 of 3 |
---|
44 | 44 | | project sitting idle, as the case may be, and provide evidence, reasonably satisfactory to the 1 |
---|
45 | 45 | | commission, that the condition or event causing same has been resolved. All taxpayers shall submit 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | a reasonably detailed project timeline to the commission together with the Part 2 application. The 3 |
---|
47 | 47 | | provisions of this section shall be further detailed and incorporated into the form of contract for tax 4 |
---|
48 | 48 | | credits used in connection with this chapter. 5 |
---|
49 | 49 | | (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, projects that have been 6 |
---|
50 | 50 | | approved for historic preservation tax credits and have been funded through the cultural arts and 7 |
---|
51 | 51 | | the economy grant program, as enacted in P.L. 2014, ch. 145, and whose contract for tax credits 8 |
---|
52 | 52 | | would expire on December 31, 2019, are not subject to the provisions of this section and shall 9 |
---|
53 | 53 | | remain in full force and effect until December 31, 2022. 10 |
---|
54 | 54 | | (c) Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter or any prior or succeeding law to 11 |
---|
55 | 55 | | the contrary, as a result of executive orders issued by the governor of the State of Rhode Island 12 |
---|
56 | 56 | | declaring and continuing a state of emergency due to the COVID-19 pandemic, any date for 13 |
---|
57 | 57 | | commencement of substantial construction activities, any completion date or any placed in service 14 |
---|
58 | 58 | | date required under this chapter (or any prior or succeeding law) or under any contract for tax 15 |
---|
59 | 59 | | credits originally expected to occur between March 9, 2020 and December 31, 2024 is extended to 16 |
---|
60 | 60 | | December 31, 2026. No project having any contact for tax credits shall be deemed to have remained 17 |
---|
61 | 61 | | idle during the period between March 9, 2020 and December 31, 2024. 18 |
---|
62 | 62 | | SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 19 |
---|
63 | 63 | | ======== |
---|
64 | 64 | | LC002930 |
---|
65 | 65 | | ======== |
---|
66 | 66 | | |
---|
67 | 67 | | |
---|
68 | 68 | | LC002930 - Page 3 of 3 |
---|
69 | 69 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
70 | 70 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
71 | 71 | | OF |
---|
72 | 72 | | A N A C T |
---|
73 | 73 | | RELATING TO TAXATION -- HISTORIC PRESERVATION TAX CREDITS 2013 |
---|
74 | 74 | | *** |
---|
75 | 75 | | This act would extend the commencement of substantial construction activities date, 1 |
---|
76 | 76 | | completion date or placed in service date, to December 31, 2026 and no project shall be deemed 2 |
---|
77 | 77 | | idle between March 9, 2020 and December 31, 2024. 3 |
---|
78 | 78 | | This act would take effect upon passage. 4 |
---|
79 | 79 | | ======== |
---|
80 | 80 | | LC002930 |
---|
81 | 81 | | ======== |
---|