Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6403 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- H 6403
66 ========
77 LC003010
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 A N A C T
1515 RELATING TO EDUCATION -- FOUNDATION LEVEL SCHOOL SUPPORT
1616 Introduced By: Representatives McNamara, Solomon, Vella-Wilkinson, and Shanley
1717 Date Introduced: May 12, 2023
1818 Referred To: House Finance
1919
2020
2121 It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows:
2222 SECTION 1. Section 16-7-41.1 of the General Laws in Chapter 16-7 entitled "Foundation 1
2323 Level School Support [See Title 16 Chapter 97 — The Rhode Island Board of Education Act]" is 2
2424 hereby amended to read as follows: 3
2525 16-7-41.1. Eligibility for reimbursement. 4
2626 (a) School districts, not municipalities, may apply for and obtain approval for a project 5
2727 under the necessity of school construction process set forth in the regulations of the council on 6
2828 elementary and secondary education, provided, however, in the case of a municipality that issues 7
2929 bonds through the Rhode Island health and educational building corporation to finance or refinance 8
3030 school facilities for a school district that is not part of the municipality, the municipality may apply 9
3131 for and obtain approval for a project. Such approval will remain valid until June 30 of the third 10
3232 fiscal year following the fiscal year in which the council on elementary and secondary education’s 11
3333 approval is granted. Only those projects undertaken at school facilities under the care and control 12
3434 of the school committee and located on school property may qualify for reimbursement under §§ 13
3535 16-7-35 — 16-7-47. Facilities with combined school and municipal uses or facilities that are 14
3636 operated jointly with any other profit or nonprofit agency do not qualify for reimbursement under 15
3737 §§ 16-7-35 — 16-7-47. Projects completed by June 30 of a fiscal year are eligible for principal 16
3838 reimbursement in the following fiscal year. Interest payments on approved projects are eligible for 17
3939 state reimbursement each fiscal year commencing with the first interest payment date irrespective 18
4040 of project completion. A project for new school housing or additional housing shall be deemed to 19
4141
4242
4343 LC003010 - Page 2 of 4
4444 be completed when the work has been officially accepted by the school committee or when the 1
4545 housing is occupied for its intended use by the school committee, whichever is earlier. 2
4646 (b) Notwithstanding the provisions of this section, the board of regents shall not grant final 3
4747 approval for any project between June 30, 2011, and May 1, 2015, except for projects that are 4
4848 necessitated by immediate health and safety reasons. In the event that a project is requested during 5
4949 the moratorium because of immediate health and safety reasons, those proposals shall be reported 6
5050 to the chairs of the house and senate finance committees. 7
5151 (c) Any project approval granted prior to the adoption of the school construction 8
5252 regulations in 2007, and which are currently inactive; and any project approval granted prior to the 9
5353 adoption of the school construction regulations in 2007 which did not receive voter approval or 10
5454 which has not been previously financed, are no longer eligible for reimbursement under this 11
5555 chapter. The department of elementary and secondary education shall develop recommendations 12
5656 for further cost containment strategies in the school housing aid program. 13
5757 (d) Beginning July 1, 2015, the council on elementary and secondary education shall 14
5858 approve new necessity of school construction applications on an annual basis. The department of 15
5959 elementary and secondary education shall develop an annual application timeline for local 16
6060 education agencies seeking new necessity of school construction approvals. 17
6161 (e) Beginning July 1, 2019, no state funding shall be provided for projects in excess of ten 18
6262 million dollars ($10,000,000) unless the prime contractor for the project has received 19
6363 prequalification from the school building authority. 20
6464 (f) Beginning July 1, 2019, the necessity of school construction process set forth in the 21
6565 regulations of the council on elementary and secondary education shall include a single statewide 22
6666 process, developed with the consultation of the department of environmental management, that will 23
6767 ensure community involvement throughout the investigation and remediation of contaminated 24
6868 building sites for possible reuse as the location of a school. That process will fulfill all provisions 25
6969 of § 23-19.14-5 related to the investigation of reuse of such sites for schools. 26
7070 (g) Beginning July 1, 2019, school housing projects exceeding one million five hundred 27
7171 thousand dollars ($1,500,000) subject to inflation shall include an owner’s program manager and a 28
7272 commissioning agent. The cost of the program manager and commissioning agent shall be 29
7373 considered a project cost eligible for aid pursuant to §§ 16-7-41 and 16-105-5. 30
7474 (h) Temporary housing, or swing space, for students shall be a reimbursable expense so 31
7575 long as a district can demonstrate that no other viable option to temporarily house students exists 32
7676 and provided that use of the temporary space is time limited for a period not to exceed twenty-four 33
7777 (24) months and tied to a specific construction project. 34
7878
7979
8080 LC003010 - Page 3 of 4
8181 (i) Environmental site remediation, as defined by the school building authority, shall be a 1
8282 reimbursable expense up to one million dollars ($1,000,000) per project. 2
8383 (j) If, within thirty (30) years of construction, a newly constructed school is sold to a private 3
8484 entity, the state shall receive a portion of the sale proceeds equal to that project’s housing aid 4
8585 reimbursement rate at the time of project completion. 5
8686 (k) All projects must comply with § 37-13-6, ensuring that prevailing wage laws are being 6
8787 followed, and § 37-14.1-6, ensuring that minority business enterprises reach a minimum of ten 7
8888 percent (10%) of the dollar value of the bid. 8
8989 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 9
9090 ========
9191 LC003010
9292 ========
9393
9494
9595 LC003010 - Page 4 of 4
9696 EXPLANATION
9797 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
9898 OF
9999 A N A C T
100100 RELATING TO EDUCATION -- FOUNDATION LEVEL SCH OOL SUPPORT
101101 ***
102102 This act would provide that for certain school construction projects, interest payments 1
103103 made by municipalities on approved projects would be eligible for state reimbursement each fiscal 2
104104 year commencing with the date of the first interest payment, regardless of whether the construction 3
105105 project is completed or not. 4
106106 This act would take effect upon passage. 5
107107 ========
108108 LC003010
109109 ========