House | 06/22/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2023) | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2023) | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |