1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 6477 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC003125 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO EDUCATION -- APPRENTICESHIP PATHWAYS TO EARNING A |
---|
16 | 16 | | BACHELOR'S DEGREE ACT |
---|
17 | 17 | | Introduced By: Representatives McNamara, Giraldo, Sanchez, Potter, Cruz, and Boylan |
---|
18 | 18 | | Date Introduced: June 02, 2023 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Referred To: House Education |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 1. Title 16 of the General Laws entitled "EDUCATION" is hereby amended by 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | adding thereto the following chapter: 2 |
---|
25 | 25 | | CHAPTER 112 3 |
---|
26 | 26 | | APPRENTICESHIP PATHWAYS TO EARNING A BACHELOR'S DEGREE ACT 4 |
---|
27 | 27 | | 16-112-1. Short title. 5 |
---|
28 | 28 | | This chapter shall be known and may be cited as the “Apprenticeship Pathways to Earning 6 |
---|
29 | 29 | | a Bachelor’s Degree Act.” 7 |
---|
30 | 30 | | 16-112-2. Definitions. 8 |
---|
31 | 31 | | As used in this section: 9 |
---|
32 | 32 | | (1) “Apprenticeship” means an apprenticeship program that meets the standards 10 |
---|
33 | 33 | | established in the National Apprenticeship Act 29 CFR Part 29, and that is registered with the 11 |
---|
34 | 34 | | department of labor and training. 12 |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) “Board” means the board of education. 13 |
---|
36 | 36 | | 16-112-3. Implementation. 14 |
---|
37 | 37 | | (a) By January 1, 2024, each state public higher education institution shall adopt policies 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | establishing nontraditional pathways to earning a bachelor’s degree at the state's public higher 16 |
---|
39 | 39 | | education institutions through the inclusion of credits earned through apprenticeships, as further 17 |
---|
40 | 40 | | provided in subsection (e) of this section. 18 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | LC003125 - Page 2 of 4 |
---|
44 | 44 | | (b) The policies adopted by each higher education institution shall be subject to review and 1 |
---|
45 | 45 | | approval of the board of education. The board shall reject or modify any policies that are unduly 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | burdensome for students seeking the apprenticeship pathway to earning a bachelor’s degree. This 3 |
---|
47 | 47 | | review shall be completed by April 1, 2024. 4 |
---|
48 | 48 | | (c) In addition, the board of education shall adopt policies to uniformly address the 5 |
---|
49 | 49 | | following: 6 |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) The form and manner in which registered apprenticeships may be determined to be 7 |
---|
51 | 51 | | eligible for inclusion in a nontraditional pathway to earning a bachelor's degree, including through 8 |
---|
52 | 52 | | public-private partnerships or an application process. 9 |
---|
53 | 53 | | (d) No later than September 1, 2024, the board shall convene a workgroup, including, but 10 |
---|
54 | 54 | | not limited to, representatives from the department of labor and training, the office of the 11 |
---|
55 | 55 | | postsecondary commissioner, public higher education institutions, the state apprenticeship council, 12 |
---|
56 | 56 | | and the construction trades. The purpose of the workgroup is to advise the board regarding the 13 |
---|
57 | 57 | | implementation of nontraditional pathways to earning a bachelor’s degree, including assisting with 14 |
---|
58 | 58 | | the review pursuant to subsection (b) of this section and with the development of the plan required 15 |
---|
59 | 59 | | by 16-112-4. 16 |
---|
60 | 60 | | (e) The policies that shall be adopted by each public higher education institution shall 17 |
---|
61 | 61 | | include, but not be limited to: 18 |
---|
62 | 62 | | (1) The process by which a student may request academic credit for registered 19 |
---|
63 | 63 | | apprenticeship coursework and experience; 20 |
---|
64 | 64 | | (2) The number of credits a student may earn through coursework and experience hours in 21 |
---|
65 | 65 | | a registered apprenticeship; 22 |
---|
66 | 66 | | (3) The development of clear guidelines distinguishing credit-bearing and non-credit-23 |
---|
67 | 67 | | bearing apprenticeship coursework including, but not limited to, standardizing the process of 24 |
---|
68 | 68 | | assigning credit to apprenticeship coursework; and 25 |
---|
69 | 69 | | (4) Guidelines to determine degree majors towards which credits for apprenticeships may 26 |
---|
70 | 70 | | be earned, including giving priority to majors that have both a low completion rate and a hiring 27 |
---|
71 | 71 | | need by employers existing in the state. 28 |
---|
72 | 72 | | (f) The policies of the public higher education institutions adopted pursuant to this section 29 |
---|
73 | 73 | | shall become effective beginning August 1,2024. 30 |
---|
74 | 74 | | 16-112-4. Reporting. 31 |
---|
75 | 75 | | No later than August 1, 2025, the board shall provide the governor, the president of the 32 |
---|
76 | 76 | | senate, and the speaker of the house of representatives a plan for increasing the number of students 33 |
---|
77 | 77 | | who earn credit towards and/or complete bachelor's degrees from a Rhode Island public institution 34 |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|
80 | 80 | | LC003125 - Page 3 of 4 |
---|
81 | 81 | | of higher education through a registered apprenticeship. The board may create additional reporting 1 |
---|
82 | 82 | | requirements to focus on data collection for the purposes of program progress, goals, and 2 |
---|
83 | 83 | | participation. 3 |
---|
84 | 84 | | SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 4 |
---|
85 | 85 | | ======== |
---|
86 | 86 | | LC003125 |
---|
87 | 87 | | ======== |
---|
88 | 88 | | |
---|
89 | 89 | | |
---|
90 | 90 | | LC003125 - Page 4 of 4 |
---|
91 | 91 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
92 | 92 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
93 | 93 | | OF |
---|
94 | 94 | | A N A C T |
---|
95 | 95 | | RELATING TO EDUCATION -- APPRENTICESHIP PATHW AYS TO EARNING A |
---|
96 | 96 | | BACHELOR'S DEGREE ACT |
---|
97 | 97 | | *** |
---|
98 | 98 | | This act would create the Apprenticeship Pathways to Earning a Bachelor’s Degree Act, to 1 |
---|
99 | 99 | | enable an individual to earn a bachelor’s degree at public higher education institutions throughout 2 |
---|
100 | 100 | | the state by earning credits through apprenticeships. 3 |
---|
101 | 101 | | This act would take effect upon passage. 4 |
---|
102 | 102 | | ======== |
---|
103 | 103 | | LC003125 |
---|
104 | 104 | | ======== |
---|