Senate | 06/13/2023 | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2023) | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |