House | 06/15/2023 | House voted to recommit to House Municipal Government & Housing | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |