House | 06/23/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |