LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Rhode Island RI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
H6523
Action History
RI
Rhode Island House Bill H6523
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6523
Action History
House
06/22/2023
Signed by Governor
House
06/19/2023
Transmitted to Governor
Senate
06/16/2023
Senate passed in concurrence
Senate
06/15/2023
Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2023)
House
06/15/2023
House read and passed
House
06/14/2023
Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023)