Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6529 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- H 6529 
======== 
LC003119 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
RECOGNIZING "JUNETEENTH NATIONAL FREEDOM DAY" ON JUNE 19, 2023 
Introduced By: Representatives Henries, Biah, Stewart, Alzate, Shekarchi, Blazejewski, 
Chippendale, Abney, Felix, and Hull 
Date Introduced: June 14, 2023 
Referred To: House read and passed 
 
 
WHEREAS, Juneteenth originated in Galveston, Texas, on June 19, 1865, in celebration 1 
of the emancipation of those who had been enslaved in America. The tradition of marking the end 2 
of slavery with Emancipation Day celebrations had an earlier beginning in South Carolina on 3 
January 1, 1863, in recognition of the signing of the Emancipation Proclamation. Even earlier 4 
celebrations of emancipation date back to when slavery was abolished throughout the British 5 
Empire on August 1, 1834; and 6 
WHEREAS, Each year after 1834, on August 1, major emancipation celebrations were 7 
organized across the West Indies and American cities with free African heritage populations. The 8 
Rhode Island cities of Providence, Newport and East Providence were early sites for major 9 
Emancipation Day celebrations and festivals dating back to the 1850s. During the 20th century, 10 
tens of thousands of people attended Emancipation Day events at Roger Williams Park, Rocky 11 
Point, and Crescent Park; and 12 
WHEREAS, Juneteenth is part of a number of emancipation celebrations that date back 13 
to the early 19th century; and 14 
WHEREAS, Also known as Emancipation Day, Emancipation Celebration, Freedom 15 
Day, Jun-Jun, and Juneteenth, Juneteenth National Freedom Day commemorates the strong 16 
survival instinct of African Americans who were first brought to this country stacked in the 17 
bottom of slave ships in a month-long journey across the Atlantic Ocean known as the Middle 18 
Passage; and 19 
WHEREAS, Approximately eleven and a half million Africans survived the voyage to 20   
 
 
LC003119 - Page 2 of 3 
the New World, with the number that died likely greater, and those who did survive were 1 
subjected to whipping, castration, branding, and rape, and were forced to submit to slavery for 2 
more than two hundred years after their arrival in the United States; and 3 
WHEREAS, Events in the history of the United States that led to the Civil War of 1861 4 
centered around sectional differences between the North and South that were based on the 5 
economic and social divergence caused by the existence of slavery; and 6 
WHEREAS, Abraham Lincoln was inaugurated as President of the United States in 1861, 7 
and as President, he believed and stated that the paramount object of the Civil War was to save 8 
the Union rather than to save or destroy slavery; and 9 
WHEREAS, Lincoln also stated that it was his belief that all men everywhere should be 10 
free, thus adding to the growing anticipation for slaves that their ultimate liberation was at hand; 11 
and 12 
WHEREAS, In 1862, the first clear sign that the end of slavery was imminent came when 13 
laws abolishing slavery in the territories of Oklahoma, Nebraska, Colorado, and New Mexico 14 
were passed; and 15 
WHEREAS, In September of that same year, President Lincoln warned that if the eleven 16 
rebellious Confederate States did not return to the Union by January 1, 1863, he would declare 17 
their slaves forever free via the celebrated Emancipated Proclamation; and 18 
WHEREAS, Enforcement of the Emancipation Proclamation, however, only occurred in 19 
Confederate States once they were under Union Army control and Congress subsequently passed 20 
the Thirteenth Amendment to the Constitution on January 31, 1865, abolishing slavery 21 
throughout the United States and its territories; and 22 
WHEREAS, News of this action reached the states at different times, and it was not until 23 
June 19 of 1865, that the message of freedom reached the slaves in Texas, Oklahoma, Louisiana, 24 
Arkansas, and California; and 25 
WHEREAS, Spontaneous celebrations erupted throughout the country when African-26 
Americans learned of their freedom; and 27 
WHEREAS, Juneteenth National Freedom Day celebrates the abolishment of slavery 28 
with excitement and great joy and is a reminder to all Americans of the status and importance that 29 
Americans of African descent hold as American citizens; now, therefore be it  30 
RESOLVED, That this House of Representatives of the State of Rhode Island hereby 31 
urges the citizens of the State of Rhode Island to join in recognizing the historical significance of 32 
Juneteenth Independence Day and the observance of Juneteenth National Freedom Day on June 33 
19
th
; and be it further 34   
 
 
LC003119 - Page 3 of 3 
RESOLVED, That this House hereby supports the annual celebration of Juneteenth 1 
National Freedom Day in order to provide an opportunity for the people of the State to learn more 2 
about our country’s past and to better understand the experiences that have shaped our nation; and 3 
be it further 4 
RESOLVED, That the Secretary of State be and hereby is authorized and directed to 5 
transmit a duly certified copy of this resolution to the Honorable Daniel J. McKee, Governor of 6 
the State of Rhode Island. 7 
======== 
LC003119 
========