House | 06/22/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2023 | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/16/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | House passed Sub B | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub B | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Referred to House Corporations | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2023) | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |