Senate | 05/15/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/27/2023) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2023) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to House Finance | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2023) | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |