Senate | 03/22/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (03/21/2023) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred to House Finance | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/07/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (02/28/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |