Senate | 04/07/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/04/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/30/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2023) | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |