House | 05/10/2023 | Referred to House Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/09/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Meeting postponed (04/20/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |