Senate | 05/18/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/18/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2023) | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |