House | 05/31/2023 | Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |