House | 06/24/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2023 | House passed as amended in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/16/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/16/2023 | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) | ||
House | 06/16/2023 | Senate voted to reconsider | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |