Senate | 06/14/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |