1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- S 0081 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC000840 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- |
---|
16 | 16 | | CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS |
---|
17 | 17 | | Introduced By: Senators Felag, Ciccone, Sosnowski, and F. Lombardi |
---|
18 | 18 | | Date Introduced: February 01, 2023 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Referred To: Senate Finance |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 1. Section 36-10-1 of the General Laws in Chapter 36-10 entitled "Retirement 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | System — Contributions and Benefits" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 |
---|
25 | 25 | | 36-10-1. Member contributions — Deduction from compensation. 3 |
---|
26 | 26 | | (a) Prior to July 1, 2012, each member of the retirement system shall contribute an amount 4 |
---|
27 | 27 | | equal to eight and three-quarters percent (8.75%) of his or her compensation as his or her share of 5 |
---|
28 | 28 | | the cost of annuities, benefits, and allowances. Effective July 1, 2012, each member of the 6 |
---|
29 | 29 | | retirement system shall contribute an amount equal to three and three quarters percent (3.75%) of 7 |
---|
30 | 30 | | his or her compensation, except for correctional officers as defined in § 36-10-9.2 who shall 8 |
---|
31 | 31 | | contribute an amount equal to eight and three quarters percent (8.75%) of his or her compensation. 9 |
---|
32 | 32 | | Effective July 1, 2015, each member of the retirement system, except for correctional officers as 10 |
---|
33 | 33 | | defined in § 36-10-9.2, with twenty (20) or more years of total service as of June 30, 2012 shall 11 |
---|
34 | 34 | | contribute an amount equal to eleven percent (11%) of compensation. The contributions shall be 12 |
---|
35 | 35 | | made in the form of deductions from compensation. Effective July 1, 2023, state employees 13 |
---|
36 | 36 | | employed as environmental police officers by the department of environmental management shall 14 |
---|
37 | 37 | | contribute an amount equal to ten percent (10%) of their compensation. 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (b) The deductions provided for herein shall be made notwithstanding that the minimum 16 |
---|
39 | 39 | | compensation provided by law for any member shall be reduced thereby. Every member shall be 17 |
---|
40 | 40 | | deemed to consent and agree to the deductions made and provided for herein and receipt of his or 18 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | LC000840 - Page 2 of 4 |
---|
44 | 44 | | her full compensation and payment of compensation, less the deductions, shall be a full and 1 |
---|
45 | 45 | | complete discharge and acquittance of all claims and demands whatsoever for the services rendered 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | by the person during the period covered by the payment except as to the benefit provided under this 3 |
---|
47 | 47 | | chapter. 4 |
---|
48 | 48 | | SECTION 2. Section 36-10.3-1 of the General Laws in Chapter 36-10.3 entitled "Defined 5 |
---|
49 | 49 | | Contribution Retirement Plan" is hereby amended to read as follows: 6 |
---|
50 | 50 | | 36-10.3-1. Definitions. 7 |
---|
51 | 51 | | As used in this chapter, the following terms, unless the context requires a different 8 |
---|
52 | 52 | | interpretation, shall have the following meanings: 9 |
---|
53 | 53 | | (1) “Compensation” means compensation as defined in § 36-8-1(8). 10 |
---|
54 | 54 | | (2) “Employee” means an employee as defined in §§ 36-8-1(9) and 45-21-2(7) and a 11 |
---|
55 | 55 | | teacher as defined in § 16-16-1(12), effective July 1, 2012; provided however, effective July 1, 12 |
---|
56 | 56 | | 2015, “employee” shall not include any employee with twenty (20) or more years of total service 13 |
---|
57 | 57 | | as of June 30, 2012, in the employees retirement system under chapters 8 through 10 of title 36 or 14 |
---|
58 | 58 | | chapter 16 of title 16 (ERS), or the municipal employees retirement system under chapter 21 of 15 |
---|
59 | 59 | | title 45 (MERS); provided, however, effective July 1, 2023, "employee" shall not include 16 |
---|
60 | 60 | | environmental police officers employed by the department of environmental management. 17 |
---|
61 | 61 | | (3) “Employer” means the State of Rhode Island or the local municipality which employs 18 |
---|
62 | 62 | | a member of the Employees Retirement System under chapters 8 through 10 of title 36 or chapter 19 |
---|
63 | 63 | | 16 of title 16 (ERS) or the Municipal Employees Retirement System under chapters 21 and 21.2 of 20 |
---|
64 | 64 | | title 45 (MERS). 21 |
---|
65 | 65 | | (4) “Plan” means the retirement plan established by this chapter. 22 |
---|
66 | 66 | | (5) A “public safety member” shall mean a member of MERS who is a municipal fire 23 |
---|
67 | 67 | | fighter or a municipal policeman or policewoman as defined in § 45-21.2-2 who does not participate 24 |
---|
68 | 68 | | in Social Security under the Federal Old Age, Survivors, and Disability income program. 25 |
---|
69 | 69 | | (6) “Regular member” means: 26 |
---|
70 | 70 | | (i) An employee who is a member of ERS other than correctional officers as defined in § 27 |
---|
71 | 71 | | 36-10-9.2; or 28 |
---|
72 | 72 | | (ii) An employee who is a member of MERS other than a public safety member. 29 |
---|
73 | 73 | | (7) The “retirement board” or “board” shall mean the retirement board of the Employees 30 |
---|
74 | 74 | | Retirement System of Rhode Island as defined in chapter 8 of this title. The retirement board shall 31 |
---|
75 | 75 | | be the plan administrator and plan trustee and shall administer the plan in accordance with § 36-8-32 |
---|
76 | 76 | | 4.1. 33 |
---|
77 | 77 | | (8) “State investment commission” or “commission” means the state investment 34 |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|
80 | 80 | | LC000840 - Page 3 of 4 |
---|
81 | 81 | | commission as defined in § 35-10-1. 1 |
---|
82 | 82 | | (9) “Supplemental employer” includes any employer that provides supplemental 2 |
---|
83 | 83 | | contributions to the defined contribution retirement plan as provided in § 36-10.3-3. 3 |
---|
84 | 84 | | (10) “Supplemental member” is defined in § 36-10.3-3. 4 |
---|
85 | 85 | | SECTION 3. Chapter 36-10 of the General Laws entitled "Retirement System - 5 |
---|
86 | 86 | | Contributions and Benefits" is hereby amended by adding thereto the following section: 6 |
---|
87 | 87 | | 36-10-9.8. Retirement on service allowance -- State law enforcement professionals. 7 |
---|
88 | 88 | | Effective July 1, 2023, notwithstanding any special law or general law, rule or regulation 8 |
---|
89 | 89 | | to the contrary, state employees employed as environmental police officers employed by the 9 |
---|
90 | 90 | | department of environmental management shall be entitled to the benefits provided by §§ 45-21.2-10 |
---|
91 | 91 | | 5, 45-21.2-6, 45-21.2-10, 45-21.2-11, 45-21.2-12, and 45-21.2-13. 11 |
---|
92 | 92 | | SECTION 4. This act shall take effect upon passage. 12 |
---|
93 | 93 | | ======== |
---|
94 | 94 | | LC000840 |
---|
95 | 95 | | ======== |
---|
96 | 96 | | |
---|
97 | 97 | | |
---|
98 | 98 | | LC000840 - Page 4 of 4 |
---|
99 | 99 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
100 | 100 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
101 | 101 | | OF |
---|
102 | 102 | | A N A C T |
---|
103 | 103 | | RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYE ES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- |
---|
104 | 104 | | CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS |
---|
105 | 105 | | *** |
---|
106 | 106 | | This act would, effective July 1, 2023, entitle environmental police officers to the benefits 1 |
---|
107 | 107 | | provided by chapter 21.2 of title 45 entitled "Optional retirement for members of police force and 2 |
---|
108 | 108 | | firefighters." 3 |
---|
109 | 109 | | This act would take effect upon passage. 4 |
---|
110 | 110 | | ======== |
---|
111 | 111 | | LC000840 |
---|
112 | 112 | | ======== |
---|
113 | 113 | | |
---|