Senate | 06/26/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |