House | 06/19/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2023) | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Referred to House Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/04/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |