Senate | 06/27/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |