Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island Senate Bill S0138 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- S 0138
66 ========
77 LC000347
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 A N A C T
1515 RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES
1616 Introduced By: Senators Raptakis, F. Lombardi, Quezada, Euer, Ciccone, E Morgan,
1717 Sosnowski, DiPalma, Burke, and Ujifusa
1818 Date Introduced: February 01, 2023
1919 Referred To: Senate Labor
2020
2121
2222 It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows:
2323 SECTION 1. Section 28-12-3 of the General Laws in Chapter 28-12 entitled "Minimum 1
2424 Wages" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2
2525 28-12-3. Minimum wages. 3
2626 (a) Every employer shall pay to each of his or her employees: commencing July 1, 1999, 4
2727 at least the minimum wage of five dollars and sixty-five cents ($5.65) per hour. Commencing 5
2828 September 1, 2000, the minimum wage is six dollars and fifteen cents ($6.15) per hour. 6
2929 (b) Commencing January 1, 2004, the minimum wage is six dollars and seventy-five cents 7
3030 ($6.75) per hour. 8
3131 (c) Commencing March 1, 2006, the minimum wage is seven dollars and ten cents ($7.10) 9
3232 per hour. 10
3333 (d) Commencing January 1, 2007, the minimum wage is seven dollars and forty cents 11
3434 ($7.40) per hour. 12
3535 (e) Commencing January 1, 2013, the minimum wage is seven dollars and seventy-five 13
3636 cents ($7.75) per hour. 14
3737 (f) Commencing January 1, 2014, the minimum wage is eight dollars ($8.00) per hour. 15
3838 (g) Commencing January 1, 2015, the minimum wage is nine dollars ($9.00) per hour. 16
3939 (h) Commencing January 1, 2016, the minimum wage is nine dollars and sixty cents ($9.60) 17
4040 per hour. 18
4141 (i) Commencing January 1, 2018, the minimum wage is ten dollars and ten cents ($10.10) 19
4242
4343
4444 LC000347 - Page 2 of 3
4545 per hour. 1
4646 (j) Commencing January 1, 2019, the minimum wage is ten dollars and fifty cents ($10.50) 2
4747 per hour. 3
4848 (k) Commencing October 1, 2020, the minimum wage is eleven dollars and fifty cents 4
4949 ($11.50) per hour. 5
5050 (l) Commencing January 1, 2022, the minimum wage is twelve dollars and twenty-five 6
5151 cents ($12.25) per hour. 7
5252 (m) Commencing January 1, 2023, the minimum wage is thirteen dollars ($13.00) per hour. 8
5353 (n) Commencing January 1, 2024, the minimum wage is fourteen dollars ($14.00) per hour. 9
5454 (o) Commencing January 1, 2025, the minimum wage is fifteen dollars ($15.00) per hour. 10
5555 (p) Commencing January 1, 2028, the minimum wage shall be increased by an amount 11
5656 equal to the total percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-12
5757 U) published by the United States Department of Labor Bureau of Labor Statistics for the Northeast 13
5858 9 Region for the calendar year 2026, but in no event shall the minimum wage decrease to reflect 14
5959 any decrease in the CPI-U. 15
6060 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 16
6161 ========
6262 LC000347
6363 ========
6464
6565
6666 LC000347 - Page 3 of 3
6767 EXPLANATION
6868 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
6969 OF
7070 A N A C T
7171 RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELA TIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES
7272 ***
7373 This act would increase the minimum hourly wage commencing January 1, 2028, by an 1
7474 amount equal to the total percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers 2
7575 (CPI-U) for the Northeast Region for the calendar year 2026. 3
7676 This act would take effect upon passage. 4
7777 ========
7878 LC000347
7979 ========
8080