2023 -- S 0149 ======== LC001129 ======== S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 ____________ S E N A T E R E S O L U T I O N REINSTATING THE LIFE OF AND EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY JUSTICE REINVESTMENT PROPOSA LS AND PROVIDE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR REDUC ING THE INCARCERATION OF WOMEN Introduced By: Senator Meghan E. Kallman Date Introduced: February 01, 2023 Referred To: Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 281 1 passed by the Senate at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved June 01, 2021, entitled 2 "Senate Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission to Study Justice Reinvestment 3 Proposals and Provide Recommendations for Reducing the Incarceration of Women" is hereby 4 reinstated and the same members are hereby reappointed, and it is authorized to continue its study 5 and make a report to the General Assembly on or before November 10, 2023, and said 6 commission shall expire on January 6, 2024; and be it further 7 RESOLVED, That the time for reporting and date of expiration authorized by resolution 8 No. 281, passed by the General Assembly at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved June 1, 9 2021, be and the same is hereby rescinded. 10 ======== LC001129 ======== LC001129 - Page 2 of 2 EXPLANATION BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL OF S E N A T E R E S O L U T I O N REINSTATING THE LIFE OF AND EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY JUSTICE REINVESTMENT PROPOSA LS AND PROVIDE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR REDUC ING THE INCARCERATION OF WOMEN *** This resolution would reinstate and extend the reporting and expiration dates of the 1 commission to study justice reinvestment proposals and make recommendations to reduce the 2 incarceration of women, from June 1, 2022 to November 10, 2023, and expires on January 6, 3 2024. 4 ======== LC001129 ========