Senate | 05/10/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2023) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2023) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to House Corporations | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/07/2023) |